open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-05203-
    Party Name:Michele Denise Putnam
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order regarding filing fee due)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Transfer of Claim)]
    Date Published:December 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Reassigning Case in the Interests of Judicial Economy]
    Date Published:February 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Substitution of Attorney (batch)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Answer]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Hearing)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Reconsider, Alter, Amend or Vacate Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?237748
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =