open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-04596-
    Party Name:Joseph L Bollard
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Dismissing Case/Party]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Intent to Dismiss for nonappearance at 341 meeting)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Meeting of Creditors (No Show - Dismiss Party)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Martin, (Trustee) John J [Order on Motion to Convert Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Order on Motion to Convert Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Convert Case]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing (or Conference, Preliminary Hearing, Status Conference, Pre-Trial Conference, Argument)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request to List Matter for Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Reassigning Case in the Interests of Judicial Economy]
    Date Published:February 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation Due]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Answer]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Transfer of Claim)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Substitution of Attorney (batch)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?237032
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =