open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-bk-02062-
    Party Name:ECSM Utility Contractors, Inc
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Certification of Completion of Estate Administration by Trustee and Application for Discharge]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order regarding Allowances in Trustees Final Report & Account and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Notice of Final Report and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Notice to Trustee (Final Report received from UST)]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Trustees Final Report and Application for Fees]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Certificate of fees and bill for collection (0.00 due)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Request for Court Costs]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Failure to Include Revisable Order]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Objection]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Caption of Motion does not contain a Respondent]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Filing Fee Due]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Adversary Proceeding Reopened/Reinstated]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Exhibit]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Claim having been filed)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Claim filed by Debtor or Trustee]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Trustees Initial Report]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [PDF document]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Motion to Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition the use, sale or lease of property]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition of Property]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Request to Discontinue Service of Notices]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Motion to Appoint]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Notice of Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition of Property and Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Hearing (Sale Free and Clear)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Flags Set or Removed]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Meeting of Creditors Held and Continued]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Appoint (Examiner or Trustee)(do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Attorney, Ombudsman or Professional)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Answer]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Generic Document]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Motion to Redact]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Redact (NOT to be used for redacting personal data identifiers in Transcripts)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Objection to Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Notice of Change to Asset Case]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Certificate of outstanding quarterly fees]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Amendment to Petition/List of Creditors/Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled BEFORE 341 meeting called to order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Meeting of Creditors (Continued)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Application to Employ]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Post Petition Debts pursuant to FRBP 1019(5)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Order sent to counsel for mailing (to parties in interest) (*ECF Atty*)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Slobodian, (Trustee) Markian R [Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234352
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =