open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-04411-
    Party Name:Scott Michael Soden
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Report from Trustee re: Unclaimed Funds/Small Dividends]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:May 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Final Decree (Ch. 7 indiv and business Cases)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds collected]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Stop BNC Request]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [122A Forms]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:January 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Add Trustee by US Trustee]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sheils,, Jr (Trustee) Robert P. [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (108) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (108) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Convert Case (do NOT use this event with a MOTION to Convert)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Election to Convert from Ch. 12 or 13 to Ch. 7 (Absolute Right)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Election to Convert from Ch. 12 or 13 to Ch. 7 (Absolute Right)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: **, No Trustee Appointed Yet ** [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Claim/Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order regarding Confirmation of Plan/Amended Plan)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Confirmation of Plan (Approval or Denial)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (vCal)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing called/cancl, Amended Plan filed & served)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?236841
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =