open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:11-bk-01056-
    Party Name:John Timothy Spence
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015(LBF3015-3(a), LBF3015-3(b), LBF3015-3(c), LBF3015-5, LBF3015-6)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?209267
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =