open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-21762-
    Party Name:Debra Clark-Russell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Reminder to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Supporting Documentation from 341 Meeting]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Not Held Clerk to Reschedule Meeting]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 & 12]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Convert Case from 13 to 7 First Time - Never Previously a 7]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?318369
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =