open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-21888-
    Party Name:Morgan Waldron Insurance Management, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC PDF Notice]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Report in Cases to be Closed]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315761
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =