open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-21941-
    Party Name:Joseph M. Cowan and Michelle S. Cowan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Loss Mitigation Final Report and Portal Account History]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Approval]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Extending the Period for Loss Mitigation (Local Form 43)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Extend the Period for Loss Mitigation Local Form 42]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?324183
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =