open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-11136-
    Party Name:Karen J. Loutzenhiser
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Nonconforming Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set E]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?327702
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =