open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:11-11765-
    Party Name:Pamela Ann Earley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice that Mortgage Claim has Been Paid in Full]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set E]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Funds on Reserve]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Nonconforming Document]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to the Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?301187
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =