open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:20-22398-
    Party Name:Robin M. Sheffey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Final Decree]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Dismissal Recommended]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:May 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Notice Reminder to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled by Debtor]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Continued]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [341 by Telephone]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [none]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Update Statement of Intent Deadline]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cardiello, Natalie Lutz [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 or 13 Adjourned]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:June 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Supporting Documentation from 341 Meeting]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Reminder to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 Not Held Clerk to Reschedule Meeting]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 & 12]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Final Report and Portal Account History]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Status Report]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Loss Mitigation Order Local Form 41]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Motion For Loss Mitigation Local Form 39]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Continued]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?327733
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =