open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-25047-
    Party Name:Christina M. Buch
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Certificate of Completion]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Certification of Completion of the Chapter 13 Plan -batch-]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Appl for Apprv of Fnl Rpt of Compl of Chpt 13 Pln and Fnl Rpt and Acct]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?320640
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =