open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-23625-
    Party Name:Duane M. Burgwin and Sattara A. Burgwin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set A]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Held]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan and Setting Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:June 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Compensation]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Denying Pleading for Failure to Revise Pleading]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?318448
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =