open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-24037-
    Party Name:Eugene Ernest Spence and Terri Lynn Spence
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Dismissing Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Directing Debtors To File a Notarized Affidavit Or a Ntc of Prop Mod Cnf Pln and Amd Pln]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Default Dismissal -batch-]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:July 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approve Financing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing to File Amended Plan]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?319124
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =