open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-22522-
    Party Name:Zelienople Investment Corporation
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Clerk's Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document -bk-]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Report in Cases to be Closed]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case or Debtor]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Turnover of Property]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Financial Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Report -Generic-]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Filing of Transcript]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Professional Fees]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set B]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on a Judge Bohm Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Contempt]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?316774
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =