open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-11193-
    Party Name:1340 Liberty, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Report in Cases to be Closed]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request for Clerk's Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Post Confirmation]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document -bk-]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing w/o Forms]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on Small Business Confirmation]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Small Business Plan]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement for Small Business]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Rule to Show Cause Other Action]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set E]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Financial Report]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?328032
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =