open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:07-cr-00001-2
    Party Name:USA v. MORRIS et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Plea Document]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Entered]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Eligible for Arbitration]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255) - Court Users]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for New Trial]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Designation of Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Filed]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:April 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enforce IRS Summons]
    Date Published:February 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?190794
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =