open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01349
    Party Name:HUMPHREY v. WETZEL et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADI Receipt Entry]
    Date Published:March 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?219202
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =