open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-11567-pmm
    Party Name:Brian J. Skiles
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Vacate]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transfer case from Judge Coleman to Mayer]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transfer case from Judge Fehling to Coleman]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Modify Plan]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice (Praecipe) of Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Contempt]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal & Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing- Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Default]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Response]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Consent Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Report of Plan Voting]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Set]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?439643
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =