open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:13-13925-ref
    Party Name:Catherine L. Robertson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Appeal Returned]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [District Court re: Appeal]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?430263
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =