open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00362-1
    Party Name:USA v. CHAMBERLAIN
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default and Default Judgment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220018
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =