open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00065
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. O'BRIEN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Plea and Sentence]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Add Counts]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release of Lis Pendens]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acquittal ]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Lunch]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence of Court Reporter]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Recusal]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recusal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Plea Document]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Strike]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Transfer]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bail]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Suspend Sentence]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Search Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:January 29, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?500007
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =