Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:16-cv-02605
    Party Name:LATSCH v. TRADITIONS OF HANOVER et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?517938
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =