open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:16-ap-00078-
    Party Name:Lambert v. The City of York et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Certified Document/Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Entry of Default)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [PDF document]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Failure to comply/take action]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Summons (original, amended, reissued, third-party)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Filing fee not required]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?247134
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =