open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:16-00252-elf
    Party Name:Total Comm Systems, Inc. v. J D Factors, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Settlement]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend / Shorten Time]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Hearing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Praecipe to Re-Issue]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Praecipe]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?464645
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =