U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-16229-mdc
  • Case Name: Samantha Renee Decastro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Close Case]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter 7)]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13 Notice)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DERSHAW, TERRY P. [Matrix]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.