open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04714
    Party Name:KEYES v. NEW YORK CITY JUDGES et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Audio File]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?549007
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =