U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00342-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURGESS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • March 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.