U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00450-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PANESSA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.