U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • March 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.