U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00493-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2019: [Bond]
  • July 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arrest]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.