U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00083
  • Case Name: COHEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Certified Copy of Order]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Final Discipline Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Final Discipline Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.