U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00087
  • Case Name: ONE 2013 JEEP WRANGLER, VIN #1C4BJWDG2DL560168
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.