U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00090
  • Case Name: SEGAL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Praecipe/Request]
  • August 24, 2021: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Discipline]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application/Petition]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Final Discipline Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.