U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00091
  • Case Name: NEW JERSEY BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. DELTA B.J.D.S., INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Praecipe/Request]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Praecipe/Request]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Praecipe/Request]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • January 29, 2020: [Praecipe/Request]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.