U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00864-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMILTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • July 17, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • June 14, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • April 18, 2019: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • April 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.