U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00709-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STROHM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.