U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00842-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRISTOBAL ROSA-ROBLES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Required)]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.