U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREGGS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.