U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00757-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARCIA-GUZMAN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.