U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00990-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HICKS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 06, 2019: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.