U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LYNN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Probable Cause Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 09, 2019: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 07, 2019: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.