U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-mc-00195
  • Case Name: LENTO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Response]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Unseal Document]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • July 23, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Disbarment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 12, 2019: [Reinstate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.