U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00723-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JORDAN YAISEL DEL TORO-PORTELA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.