open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02099
    Party Name:DIMARCO v. TRELOAR & HEISEL, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?556849
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =