open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02073
    Party Name:SALAMA v. LUCKYVITAMIN, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?556843
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =