open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00280-1
    Party Name:USA v. QUINONES
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Plea Document]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?556873
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =