U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOCK, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 11, 2019: [Extension of Time]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • June 19, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 16, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.