U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Order]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.