U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00117
  • Case Name: CARLSON PET PRODUCTS, INC. v. JOHN DOES 1-10
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Praecipe/Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 19, 2019: [Praecipe/Request]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.